THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 - 1902 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 5B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 726-3558
Extension: 21
Fax: (613) 688-0315
Address: 225 Preston St
Ottawa ON K1R 7R1
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3942 50A Ave
Red Deer Alberta T4N 4E7
Phone: 403-343-4526
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 15 Jul 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Martens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Oct 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 - 1902 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 5B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 726-3558
Extension: 21
Fax: (613) 688-0315
Address: 225 Preston St
Ottawa ON K1R 7R1
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3942 50A Ave
Red Deer Alberta T4N 4E7
Phone: 403-343-4526
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 15 Jul 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Martens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Oct 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANDRA GWYN RENEE MARTENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTENS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANDRA GWYN RENEE MARTENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTENS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 1998
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996