THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:06:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Winchester District Memorial
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: (613) 774-2941

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Moussette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Winchester District Memorial
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: (613) 774-2941

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Moussette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANN MOUSSETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSETTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANN MOUSSETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSETTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996