THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:52:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: Bates, Sharon Kathleen (Used Until: 22 Oct 1998)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Guelph line unit 4
Burlington Ontario L7M 3M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 288-0061
Fax: (289) 288-0473

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Carson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Dec 2024

General Information

Former Name: Bates, Sharon Kathleen (Used Until: 22 Oct 1998)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Guelph line unit 4
Burlington Ontario L7M 3M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 288-0061
Fax: (289) 288-0473

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Carson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Dec 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON KATHLEEN CARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON KATHLEEN CARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996