THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:10:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Richmond Hill Doctors
416 Elgin Mills Road West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 787-8881
Fax: (905) 787-1577
Address: 416 Elgin Mills Rd W
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4M2
Phone: 9057878881
Fax: 9057871577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Richmond Hill Doctors
416 Elgin Mills Road West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 787-8881
Fax: (905) 787-1577
Address: 416 Elgin Mills Rd W
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4M2
Phone: 9057878881
Fax: 9057871577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATEN SAMY SHOUKRALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUKRALLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATEN SAMY SHOUKRALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUKRALLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Oct 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996