THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:45:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3018 Winston Churchill unit 4
Mississauga ON L5L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-9008
Fax: (905) 828-0900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Gindi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Feb 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Mansoura University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3018 Winston Churchill unit 4
Mississauga ON L5L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 828-9008
Fax: (905) 828-0900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Gindi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Feb 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIMIANA NESSEM GINDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIMIANA NESSEM GINDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mansoura University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996