THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:55:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Davis Drive Medical Clinic
Unit 6
291 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 836-6609
Fax: (905) 830-0483

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Davis Drive Medical Clinic
Unit 6
291 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 836-6609
Fax: (905) 830-0483

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN EDWARD YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN EDWARD YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1996