THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:12:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alberta Health Services
South Health Campus
4448 Front Street Southeast
Calgary Alberta T3M 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (403) 956-3900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Jul 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alberta Health Services
South Health Campus
4448 Front Street Southeast
Calgary Alberta T3M 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (403) 956-3900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 Jul 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUIS HARVEY FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUIS HARVEY FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 25 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996