THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:35:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: Palm-Leis, Riina Ines (Used Until: 11 Mar 1997)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13069 Keele St.
King City Ontario L7B1G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-539-9333
Fax: 905-539-1964
Address: 375-10 Trench St.
Long Term Care
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C4Z3
Phone: 905-833-2102
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 351-3764
Fax: (416) 323-6130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can locate them at Record Storage and Retrieval Services.
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6

Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Riina Bray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: Palm-Leis, Riina Ines (Used Until: 11 Mar 1997)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13069 Keele St.
King City Ontario L7B1G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-539-9333
Fax: 905-539-1964
Address: 375-10 Trench St.
Long Term Care
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C4Z3
Phone: 905-833-2102
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 351-3764
Fax: (416) 323-6130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can locate them at Record Storage and Retrieval Services.
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6

Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Riina Bray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIINA INES BRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIINA INES BRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996