THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:40:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Lawrence and Frances Bloomberg
Ontario Power Generation Building
700 University Avenue Room 8 - 814
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4566
Fax: (416) 586-3152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Lawrence and Frances Bloomberg
Ontario Power Generation Building
700 University Avenue Room 8 - 814
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4566
Fax: (416) 586-3152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY LOVATSIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVATSIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY LOVATSIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOVATSIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Mar 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Mar 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996