THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:02:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 03 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 03 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 03 Oct 2013
Summary of Decision:
On October 3, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kathleen Joyce Pratt committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Pratt admitted the allegation.

Dr. Pratt submitted swabs from herself for testing for Methicillin Resistant Staphylococcus Aureus ("MRSA") and disguised them under the name and identity of an employee without the knowledge and/or consent of that individual. After learning she was MRSA positive, she treated herself for the MRSA and returned to her regular duties as a surgeon at the hospital without seeking medical care from any other physician and without confirming she was no longer colonized with MRSA. She failed to take reasonable steps to ensure the accuracy of the health record of the staff member under whose name she had submitted for testing.

In addition to antibiotics for MRSA, Dr. Pratt repeatedly prescribed other medication for herself between 2006 and 2012.

Dr. Pratt has taken a boundaries and recordkeeping course, as well as attended educational sessions relevant to surgical site infections and ethics.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

( the Registrar suspend Dr. Pratt's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months commencing 12:01 a.m. October 4, 2013.
( Dr. Pratt appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
( Dr. Pratt pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 60 days of the Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 3, 2013

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 04 Mar 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kathleen Joyce Pratt to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 4, 2016:


Dr. Pratt was the subject of a College investigation into whether she meets the standard of care and/or is incompetent in her general surgical practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Pratt may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a surgeon who is acceptable to the College, or provide minor office-based procedures under local anesthesia including any necessary consultations and prescriptions related to those minor procedures.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 03 Oct 2013
Summary of Decision:
On October 3, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kathleen Joyce Pratt committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Pratt admitted the allegation.

Dr. Pratt submitted swabs from herself for testing for Methicillin Resistant Staphylococcus Aureus ("MRSA") and disguised them under the name and identity of an employee without the knowledge and/or consent of that individual. After learning she was MRSA positive, she treated herself for the MRSA and returned to her regular duties as a surgeon at the hospital without seeking medical care from any other physician and without confirming she was no longer colonized with MRSA. She failed to take reasonable steps to ensure the accuracy of the health record of the staff member under whose name she had submitted for testing.

In addition to antibiotics for MRSA, Dr. Pratt repeatedly prescribed other medication for herself between 2006 and 2012.

Dr. Pratt has taken a boundaries and recordkeeping course, as well as attended educational sessions relevant to surgical site infections and ethics.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

( the Registrar suspend Dr. Pratt's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months commencing 12:01 a.m. October 4, 2013.
( Dr. Pratt appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
( Dr. Pratt pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within 60 days of the Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 3, 2013

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 04 Mar 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kathleen Joyce Pratt to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 4, 2016:


Dr. Pratt was the subject of a College investigation into whether she meets the standard of care and/or is incompetent in her general surgical practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Pratt may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a surgeon who is acceptable to the College, or provide minor office-based procedures under local anesthesia including any necessary consultations and prescriptions related to those minor procedures.

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2016
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 04 Jan 2014
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 04 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1996