THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saigon, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jan 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 22 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record with Dr. Nguyen may contact Record Storage & Retrieval Services at 111 St. Regis Crescent S., Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6. Phone (1-888-563-3732). Fax (1-877-398-5932).
Date Received: 19 Jan 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of Saigon, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jan 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 22 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to access a copy of their medical record with Dr. Nguyen may contact Record Storage & Retrieval Services at 111 St. Regis Crescent S., Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6. Phone (1-888-563-3732). Fax (1-877-398-5932).
Date Received: 19 Jan 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 10 Jun 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Truong Van Nguyen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 10, 2021:

Following a College investigation that raised concerns about Dr. Nguyen’s standard of practice in family medicine, Dr. Nguyen underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report and a further public complaint raised concerns about Dr. Nguyen’s standard of practice in family medicine. Dr. Nguyen underwent further remediation and submitted to a further reassessment of his practice. In the face of the reassessment report, Dr. Nguyen has agreed:

• To practice under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until his resignation date;

• To resign from the College no later than August 31, 2021 and never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Jan 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC.  A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member.  A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 10 Jun 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Truong Van Nguyen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 10, 2021:

Following a College investigation that raised concerns about Dr. Nguyen’s standard of practice in family medicine, Dr. Nguyen underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report and a further public complaint raised concerns about Dr. Nguyen’s standard of practice in family medicine. Dr. Nguyen underwent further remediation and submitted to a further reassessment of his practice. In the face of the reassessment report, Dr. Nguyen has agreed:

• To practice under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until his resignation date;

• To resign from the College no later than August 31, 2021 and never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Oct 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Jan 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC.  A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member.  A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Saigon, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Aug 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 21 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 10 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 May 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1996