THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:04:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 15 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey L. Kallmeyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 15 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey L. Kallmeyer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2011

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 02 Nov 2015
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Jeffrey Lynton Kallmeyer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 2, 2015:

Dr. Kallmeyer has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 02 Nov 2015
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Jeffrey Lynton Kallmeyer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 2, 2015:

Dr. Kallmeyer has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 15 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1996