THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital
P.O. Box 9056
835 King St West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital
P.O. Box 9056
835 King St West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN DAVID BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN DAVID BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1996