THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:44:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kennedy Medical Clinic
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-455-5445
Fax: 905-455-5665
Address: Torbram Medical Centre
105 Father Tobin Rd
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W9
Phone: (905) 789-1750
Fax: 905-789-1787
Address: 100 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 1Y8
Phone: 289-812-0194
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Nov 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Mahmood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kennedy Medical Clinic
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-455-5445
Fax: 905-455-5665
Address: Torbram Medical Centre
105 Father Tobin Rd
Brampton Ontario L6R 0W9
Phone: (905) 789-1750
Fax: 905-789-1787
Address: 100 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 1Y8
Phone: 289-812-0194
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Nov 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Mahmood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Aug 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 02 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Naseeruddin Mahmood may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Naseeruddin Mahmood may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1996
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1996