THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:28:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The East Philippines, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FUKIEN, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Frame Lake Community Health Clinic
312 Old Airport Road
Yellowknife NT X1A
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (867) 767-9125
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FUKIEN, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of The East Philippines, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Frame Lake Community Health Clinic
312 Old Airport Road
Yellowknife NT X1A
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (867) 767-9125
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE GO TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE GO TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The East Philippines, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 1996