THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:58:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Catholic University of Chile, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6939
Fax: (416) 813-8389

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Radiology
Effective: 16 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Catholic University of Chile, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6939
Fax: (416) 813-8389

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Radiology
Effective: 16 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 16 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. OSCAR MAURICIO NAVARRO KUNSTMANN may practise medicine independently in pediatric radiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. OSCAR MAURICIO NAVARRO KUNSTMANN may practise medicine independently in pediatric radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Catholic University of Chile, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 May 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Mar 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 1997