THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:16:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeff Haebe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeff Haebe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Feb 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1997
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 1997