THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:51:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Childrens Hospital
send mail to- P O Box 65559 Dundas
133 King Street West
Dundas ON L9H 2V0
Dundas Ontario L9H 6Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-5030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Childrens Hospital
send mail to- P O Box 65559 Dundas
133 King Street West
Dundas ON L9H 2V0
Dundas Ontario L9H 6Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-5030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE DOREEN ERNST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERNST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE DOREEN ERNST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERNST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 May 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1997
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 May 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 1997