THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City Centre Walk-In Clinic
500 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor Ontario N9A 3H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-0605
Fax: (519) 254-0609
Address: Roseville Garden Clinic
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Phone: 519-944-3393
Fax: 519-944-3247
Address: Roseville Garden Walk-in Clinic
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Phone: (519) 944-3393
Fax: (519) 944-3247

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: City Centre Walk-In Clinic
500 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor Ontario N9A 3H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-0605
Fax: (519) 254-0609
Address: Roseville Garden Clinic
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Phone: 519-944-3393
Fax: 519-944-3247
Address: Roseville Garden Walk-in Clinic
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Phone: (519) 944-3393
Fax: (519) 944-3247

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ANN PRADKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRADKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ANN PRADKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRADKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997