THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:47:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Dr
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-3751
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 434-5100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. THOMAS DEBOECK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Dr
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 526-3751
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 434-5100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. THOMAS DEBOECK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS JOHN DE BOECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BOECK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS JOHN DE BOECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BOECK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997