THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:01:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Arnprior And District
Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-7720
Fax: (613) 623-3354

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Arnprior And District
Memorial Hospital
350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-7720
Fax: (613) 623-3354

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ELLARD SACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON ELLARD SACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997