THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:42:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Alliston Walk In Clinic
30 Dunham Drive
Alliston Ontario L9R 0G1
Phone: (705) 434-2141
Fax: (705) 434-4582

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Alliston Walk In Clinic
30 Dunham Drive
Alliston Ontario L9R 0G1
Phone: (705) 434-2141
Fax: (705) 434-4582

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE OZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OZON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE OZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OZON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997