THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1411 Bewicke Ave
North Vancouver BC V7M 3C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 770-4264‬
Fax: (604) 770-4265‬

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1411 Bewicke Ave
North Vancouver BC V7M 3C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 770-4264‬
Fax: (604) 770-4265‬

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARAM SHAHPARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHPARAKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARAM SHAHPARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHPARAKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997