THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:25:25 PM

General Information

Former Name: Lorenzo, Melinda Czarina Santos (Used Until: 20 Jun 2002)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Address: Kingston Psychiatric Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Fax: (613) 548-5588
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fleming Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jun 2022

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

General Information

Former Name: Lorenzo, Melinda Czarina Santos (Used Until: 20 Jun 2002)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Address: Kingston Psychiatric Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Fax: (613) 548-5588
Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fleming Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jun 2022

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELINDA CZARINA LORENZO FLEMING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEMING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELINDA CZARINA LORENZO FLEMING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLEMING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 1997