THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 04:08:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: Warnock, Marcia Dawn (Used Until: 06 Apr 2000)
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Court Medical Centre
Suite 210
15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9843
Fax: (705) 728-8476

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Warnock, Marcia Dawn (Used Until: 06 Apr 2000)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Court Medical Centre
Suite 210
15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9843
Fax: (705) 728-8476

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCIA DAWN BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCIA DAWN BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997