THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:04:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 520 University Avenue West
Unit 203
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 743-3641
Fax: (519) 743-1042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Gajewski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 520 University Avenue West
Unit 203
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 743-3641
Fax: (519) 743-1042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Gajewski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN GAJEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAJEWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN GAJEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAJEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997