THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:34:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Forensic Program
Ontario Shores Centre for
Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Forensic Program
Ontario Shores Centre for
Mental Health Sciences
700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN DENISE DE FREITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE FREITAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN DENISE DE FREITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE FREITAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997