THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:47:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 226-1333 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: ‭(437) 916-9128‬
Fax: ‭(437) 800-4850‬
Address: 101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Phone: 647-362-0999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 226-1333 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1V1
Phone: 437-916-9128
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 226-1333 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: ‭(437) 916-9128‬
Fax: ‭(437) 800-4850‬
Address: 101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Phone: 647-362-0999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 226-1333 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1V1
Phone: 437-916-9128
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER GEORGE KATIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER GEORGE KATIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997