THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:58:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Gammal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gammal (CPSO#: 70207 ) Dr. M. Montalvo (CPSO#: 71490 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Gammal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gammal (CPSO#: 70207 ) Dr. M. Montalvo (CPSO#: 71490 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAX MONTALVO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTALVO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAX MONTALVO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTALVO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997