THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:44:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1226 East Water Street
Syracuse New York 13210
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3154784185
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services at: 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6; phone
1-888-563-3732 or 416-398-0638.
Date Received: 29 Jan 2020

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth A. Beasley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jan 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1226 East Water Street
Syracuse New York 13210
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3154784185
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services at: 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6; phone
1-888-563-3732 or 416-398-0638.
Date Received: 29 Jan 2020

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth A. Beasley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jan 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH ALON BEASLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEASLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH ALON BEASLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEASLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On October 16, 2010, at the Supreme Court in Erie County, a finding of Malpractice was made against Dr. Beasley.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On October 16, 2010, at the Supreme Court in Erie County, a finding of Malpractice was made against Dr. Beasley.

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997