THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 06:21:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: Gunther, Valerie Ingrid (Used Until: 12 Jan 2000)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2120 Regent Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 705-671-2335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Valerie Mantle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Mar 2025

General Information

Former Name: Gunther, Valerie Ingrid (Used Until: 12 Jan 2000)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2120 Regent Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 705-671-2335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Valerie Mantle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Mar 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE INGRID MANTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE INGRID MANTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANTLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997