THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2300
7325 Yonge St
Innisfil Ontario L9S 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 436-2251
Fax: (705) 436-7991
Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
201 Geogian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Bedard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2300
7325 Yonge St
Innisfil Ontario L9S 2M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 436-2251
Fax: (705) 436-7991
Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
201 Geogian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Bedard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE VALENTIN BEDARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE VALENTIN BEDARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEDARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Jul 2015
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Jul 2015
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997