THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lasik MD
300 - 5025 Orbitor Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5149330133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Princess St, Kingston
Kingston Ontario K7L 1A7
Phone: (613) 531-3337
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2235 Sheppard Avenue East
Atria II
North York Ontario M2J 5B5
Phone: (416) 362-8677
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 407 Laurier Avenue West
Store 10/11
Minto Place Atrium
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7Y7
Phone: (613) 288-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 King St W #120
Toronto Ontario M5X 2A1
Phone: (416) 362-8677
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Quebec
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lasik MD
300 - 5025 Orbitor Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5149330133
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Princess St, Kingston
Kingston Ontario K7L 1A7
Phone: (613) 531-3337
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2235 Sheppard Avenue East
Atria II
North York Ontario M2J 5B5
Phone: (416) 362-8677
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 407 Laurier Avenue West
Store 10/11
Minto Place Atrium
Ottawa Ontario K1R 7Y7
Phone: (613) 288-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 King St W #120
Toronto Ontario M5X 2A1
Phone: (416) 362-8677
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Quebec
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOUNIR BASHOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASHOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOUNIR BASHOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASHOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997