THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:23:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1997
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997