THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARMENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2115 Boul. Casavant ouest unit 101
Saint-Hyacinthe Quebec J2S 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (450) 223-1661
Fax: (450) 223-1324
Address: Centre Hospitalier Honore-Mercier
2750 boulevard LaFramboise
Saint-Hyacinthe Quebec J2S 4Y8
Phone: (450) 771-3335
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARMENIAN
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2115 Boul. Casavant ouest unit 101
Saint-Hyacinthe Quebec J2S 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (450) 223-1661
Fax: (450) 223-1324
Address: Centre Hospitalier Honore-Mercier
2750 boulevard LaFramboise
Saint-Hyacinthe Quebec J2S 4Y8
Phone: (450) 771-3335
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THERESE BOGHOSSIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGHOSSIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THERESE BOGHOSSIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGHOSSIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997