THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:27:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3175 Rutherford
Unit 67 Building L
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 761-6082
Fax: (905) 761-2144

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3175 Rutherford
Unit 67 Building L
Vaughan Ontario L4K 5Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 761-6082
Fax: (905) 761-2144

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAU CONG HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAU CONG HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997