THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:34:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 650-25 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 6S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162254440
Fax: 4166409454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jul 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Hajri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Hajri (CPSO#: 71793 )
Business Address: Ottawa Medical Group
4289 Innes Road
2nd Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1E 0A8
(613) 686-1911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 650-25 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 6S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162254440
Fax: 4166409454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jul 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Hajri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Hajri (CPSO#: 71793 )
Business Address: Ottawa Medical Group
4289 Innes Road
2nd Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1E 0A8
(613) 686-1911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUNIRAH ABDULLAH IBRAHIM AL-HAJRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HAJRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUNIRAH ABDULLAH IBRAHIM AL-HAJRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HAJRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1997