THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:19:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106A
525 Belmont Ave W.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-3341
Fax: (519) 742-3320
Address: Grandriver Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Surgical Oncology
106A-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 742-3341
Fax: (519) 742-3320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Elhadi Husien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106A
525 Belmont Ave W.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742-3341
Fax: (519) 742-3320
Address: Grandriver Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Surgical Oncology
106A-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 742-3341
Fax: (519) 742-3320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohamed Elhadi Husien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ELHADI MOHAMED HUSIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSIEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ELHADI MOHAMED HUSIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSIEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1997