THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:35:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1165 Creditstone Road
Concord Ontario L4K4N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-6690528
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Longgang
Room 303, Startup Building, 2001 Longxiang Boulevard,
Shenzhen Guangdong Province China
Phone: 18323270101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard H.W. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1165 Creditstone Road
Concord Ontario L4K4N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-6690528
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Longgang
Room 303, Startup Building, 2001 Longxiang Boulevard,
Shenzhen Guangdong Province China
Phone: 18323270101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard H.W. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD HO WAI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD HO WAI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1997