THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GODWIN LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GODWIN LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Oct 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1997