THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:23:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAELENE MARIE MANNERFELDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANNERFELDT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAELENE MARIE MANNERFELDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANNERFELDT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Nov 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1997