THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:30:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Zurich, 1962
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients requiring copies of their medical records can contact Records Management Ltd. as per above.
Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Date Received: 06 Apr 2018

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Zurich, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients requiring copies of their medical records can contact Records Management Ltd. as per above.
Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Date Received: 06 Apr 2018

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Zurich, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Apr 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Mar 2004
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Aug 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Aug 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1997
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2004

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2004

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2000

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 1997