THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:16:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301A-17001 Rte Transcanadienne
Kirkland QC H9H 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-694-9287
Fax: 438-899-7782
Address: 301A-17001 Rte Transcanadienne
Kirkland QC H9H 0A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Montreal Chest Institute
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal Quebec H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 843-2080
Fax: (514) 843-8070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301A-17001 Rte Transcanadienne
Kirkland QC H9H 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514-694-9287
Fax: 438-899-7782
Address: 301A-17001 Rte Transcanadienne
Kirkland QC H9H 0A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Montreal Chest Institute
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal Quebec H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 843-2080
Fax: (514) 843-8070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD JEAN DANDURAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANDURAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD JEAN DANDURAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANDURAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1997
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 1997