THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:08:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Medical Protective
Association
PO Box 8225 Station T
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1G 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Medical Protective
Association
PO Box 8225 Station T
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1G 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN RUTH ATKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATKINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN RUTH ATKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATKINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 1998