THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 20:43:18 PM

General Information

Former Name: Eckler, Amy Leigh (Used Until: 31 Jul 2001)
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-2409 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 2E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 787-3771
Fax: (416) 782-3030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Eckler, Amy Leigh (Used Until: 31 Jul 2001)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-2409 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4P 2E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 787-3771
Fax: (416) 782-3030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY LEIGH GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMY LEIGH GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998