THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:38:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: Nyenhuis, Rachelle Susanne (Used Until: 06 Jan 2004)
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Rd
Parkwood Institute Main Building
PO Box 5777 Stn B
London ON N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients who were transferred to Dr. Shizar Goosheh (CPSO#116523), call Dr. Goosheh at 519-858-0013.

For all other patients, contact DocuDavit Solutions:
Phone: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 29 May 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: Nyenhuis, Rachelle Susanne (Used Until: 06 Jan 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Rd
Parkwood Institute Main Building
PO Box 5777 Stn B
London ON N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients who were transferred to Dr. Shizar Goosheh (CPSO#116523), call Dr. Goosheh at 519-858-0013.

For all other patients, contact DocuDavit Solutions:
Phone: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 29 May 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHELLE SUSANNE LABRANCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABRANCHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHELLE SUSANNE LABRANCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABRANCHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998