THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:10:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Emergency Medicine Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Fax: (416) 864-5341
Address: One Blue Jays Way
Toronto Ontario M5V 1J1
Phone: (416) 341-1142
Fax: (416) 341-1103
Address: 226 Heath Street East
Virtual Emergency Medicine Nova Scotia
VUNS Virtual Emergency Care
Work from home
Toronto Ontario M4T 1S9
Phone: 6472226225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DJ MacKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. MacKinnon (CPSO#: 72222 )
Business Address: 226 Heath Street East
Toronto Ontario M4T 1S9
6472226225
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

Corporation Name: D. J. MacKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Emergency Medicine Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Fax: (416) 864-5341
Address: One Blue Jays Way
Toronto Ontario M5V 1J1
Phone: (416) 341-1142
Fax: (416) 341-1103
Address: 226 Heath Street East
Virtual Emergency Medicine Nova Scotia
VUNS Virtual Emergency Care
Work from home
Toronto Ontario M4T 1S9
Phone: 6472226225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DJ MacKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. MacKinnon (CPSO#: 72222 )
Business Address: 226 Heath Street East
Toronto Ontario M4T 1S9
6472226225
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8

Corporation Name: D. J. MacKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998