THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:06:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Central North Correctional Centre
1501 Fuller Avenue
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 2H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-9470
Fax: (705) 549-5124
Address: Barrie Clinic
Suite 206
49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 2H4
Phone: (705) 730-0286
Fax: (705) 730-0287

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Central North Correctional Centre
1501 Fuller Avenue
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 2H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-9470
Fax: (705) 549-5124
Address: Barrie Clinic
Suite 206
49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 2H4
Phone: (705) 730-0286
Fax: (705) 730-0287

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lorberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUNTER WOLFGANG LORBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUNTER WOLFGANG LORBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LORBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998