THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:10:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 330 Highway 7 East
Suite 510
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: (905) 707-5008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 25 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 330 Highway 7 East
Suite 510
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: (905) 707-5008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 25 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN BIK YOAK CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN BIK YOAK CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998