THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:54:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CZECH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyere St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: (613) 241-1971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site
LOCATION: Attawapiskat

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CZECH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyere St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: (613) 241-1971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 17 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site
LOCATION: Attawapiskat

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PONKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PONKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998